Financial history PLYMPTON ST MARY'S CHURCH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035293
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018
Total gross income £97.00k £111.05k £94.13k £87.48k £118.10k
Total expenditure £98.62k £110.59k £96.93k £87.39k £111.97k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £5.00k