THE ABACUS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of residential accommodation for children and young people in India Furtherance of the education of such children and adults The relief of those who are suffering hardship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- India
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 March 1994: Standard registration
- 22 January 2019: Funds received from 1051276 ANUKAR INTERNATIONAL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ALAN BAILEY | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mark Elliott | Trustee | 03 March 1994 |
|
|
||||
ALEC JOHN ELLIOTT | Trustee | 03 March 1994 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.55k | £6.21k | £4.34k | £3.85k | £4.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.55k | £0 | £9.50k | £9.20k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 3 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
1.THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF SIXTEEN IN INDIA OR ELSEWHERE WHO ARE ORPHANS OR CHILDREN OF DESTITUTES OR CHILDREN OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HANDICAP OR ARE OTHERWISE NEEDY. 2. THE RELIEF OF THE INHABITANTS OF INDIA OR ELSEWHERE WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD OR OTHER NATURAL DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THIER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE. 3. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN INDIA OR ELSEWHERE. 4. THE RELIEF AND CARE OF THE SICK IN INDIA OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
INDIA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 HIGH STREET
BLUNSDON
SWINDON
SN26 7AF
- Phone:
- 07926669062
- Email:
- info@abacustrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window