Financial history WHIMPLE PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity Number: 1035316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £59.75k £60.52k £53.10k £60.98k £87.87k
Total expenditure £49.85k £52.97k £50.31k £60.75k £85.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.03k N/A N/A N/A N/A