Trustees 1ST ANGMERING SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1035360

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Woodfield | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darren John Owen | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Busbridge | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chris Morris | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Armstrong | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Wardle | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dion Del-Smith | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Francis | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JARVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE YVONNE WARDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.