Financial history CRAG BANK UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1035396
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £80.50k £83.19k £83.13k £96.68k £80.57k
Total expenditure £67.73k £70.23k £79.55k £90.80k £107.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £68.49k £74.25k N/A £79.99k £77.79k