CRAG BANK UNDER FIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Toddler, Playgroup and Pre-school sessions for children up to 4 years old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £77,786 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY WYATT | Chair | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
garry halbard | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
alissia jackson | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
stephen kitching | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
laura patterson | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
sabrina barnes | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAREN RILEY | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
jane halbard | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
julie kitching | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.50k | £83.19k | £83.13k | £96.68k | £80.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.73k | £70.23k | £79.55k | £90.80k | £107.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.49k | £74.25k | N/A | £79.99k | £77.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 July 2024 | 404 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 July 2024 | 404 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 June 2024 | 745 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 June 2024 | 745 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 February 2022 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 February 2022 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED O1 MAY 1988 AS AMENDED 6 DECEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Brookfield Close
Bolton le Sands
CARNFORTH
LA5 8EF
- Phone:
- 07870816771
- Email:
- cbu5s@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window