SUSSEX RURAL COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reducing the incidence and impact of disadvantage and poverty on people living in rural areas, increasing the capacity of rural communities to manage change for the benefit of all their members, informing and amplifying the voice of rural communities to influence public policy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £73,666 from 4 government contract(s) and £72,641 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 March 1994: Standard registration
- ACTION IN RURAL SUSSEX (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Hobbs | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BROWN | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristin Marina Sjovorr | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Ingram | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major General John Moore-Bick | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Anderson | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £631.96k | £517.18k | £536.70k | £413.38k | £479.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £549.15k | £595.16k | £590.17k | £443.88k | £469.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £103.54k | N/A | N/A | £74.60k | £73.67k | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.08k | £249.92k | £233.68k | £81.17k | £72.64k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.36k | £59.59k | £56.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £615.35k | £438.64k | £472.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.26k | £16.06k | £8.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £2.89k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.53k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £549.15k | £595.16k | £590.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.29k | £4.02k | £4.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 19TH SEPTEMBER 1996 as amended on 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE COUNTIES OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION,THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS 2) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO THAT END BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER BODIES AND PERSONS PURSUING THE ABOVE OBJECTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Market Street
LEWES
East Sussex
BN7 2NB
- Phone:
- 01273473422
- Email:
- info@ruralsussex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window