Accounts and annual returns CHRIS BROWN DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1035409
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 06 April 2017 04 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2016 05 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2015 08 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2015 Not Required