Financial history CHRIS BROWN DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1035409
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2013 06/04/2014 06/04/2015 06/04/2016 06/04/2017
Total gross income £9.94k £14.82k £11.30k £11.27k £11.23k
Total expenditure £11.81k £12.25k £11.00k £10.91k £9.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.17k £3.17k £3.17k