THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN HARPENDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harpenden u3a was established in 1982 and was the first of the many hundred of u3a's now established in the UK. It was formed so that retired or OAP's can continue their education. This is mainly achieved by attending lectures locally or elsewhere e.g. The Royal Institution or trips to museums and other places of culture or education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pat Jacques | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Waddilove | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Ball | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Louise Edward | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Williams | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Moseley | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Warr | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Thompson | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £379 | £7.12k | £5.46k | £5.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £3.02k | £5.88k | £4.19k | £5.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL-TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN HARPENDEN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HARPENDEN AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Crosthwaite Court
Stewart Road
HARPENDEN
Hertfordshire
AL5 4RN
- Phone:
- 07778380038
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window