Accounts and annual returns THE GOULD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1035453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 January 2025 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 28 January 2025 358 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 January 2025 723 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 January 2025 723 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1544 days