PHOENIX ALCOHOL COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 March 1994: Standard registration
- 17 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- P A C S (Working name)
- PHOENIX ADDICTION COUNSELLING SERVICE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 28 February 2006 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 28 February 2006 | 28 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 15 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 15 October 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION, IDENTIFICATION AND MANAGEMENT OF PROBLEMS OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY OR DEPENDENT UPON ALCOHOL AND OTHER PSYCHOACTIVE SUBSTANCES AND THE TREATMENT OR REHABILITATION OF SUCH PERSONS. 2) THE PROMOTION AND PARTICIPATION IN EDUCATION ON THE USE AND MISUSE OF PSYCHO-ACTIVE SUBSTANCES. 3) THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE AND EXTENT OF SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND THE PUBLISHING OF ANY USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window