GOTHAM PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set in a small South Nottinghamshire village, Gotham Pre-School Playgroup provides a safe, stimulating and educational environment for pre-school children of all abilities and cultures. The playgroup is now based within the local primary school and accepts children from the age of 2 from the local and surrounding area. Children wishing to attend alternative local primary schools are also welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 24 March 1994: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 February 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Moreman | Chair | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Patala | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roxanne Nicholls | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Thorley | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Jenny Howard | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Harrison | Trustee | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.48k | £50.84k | £67.99k | £53.79k | £91.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.81k | £63.87k | £59.60k | £52.58k | £69.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.72k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MAY 1985 as amended on 29 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gotham Cp School
Kegworth Road
Gotham
Nottingham
NG11 0JS
- Phone:
- 01159831272
- Email:
- gothamplaygroup@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
gothamplaygroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window