Accounts and annual returns MITCHEL TROY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035509
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 03 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 03 March 2017 On Time