Financial history MAYDAY TRUST

Charity number: 1035524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.83m £2.75m £942.37k £780.84k £848.93k
Total expenditure £3.51m £3.18m £1.18m £1.21m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £668.90k £406.24k £14.73k N/A £96.85k
Income from government grants £9.94k £45.06k £12.00k £0 £60.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £904.03k £830.27k £90.78k £10.02k £23.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.91m £1.91m £840.16k £770.82k £818.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.83k £12.91k £11.43k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.49k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.51m £3.18m £1.18m £1.17m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.68k £216 £766 £40.97k £0
Expenditure - Governance £16.01k £11.86k £11.63k £19.22k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0