Trustees THE SPRING CENTRE TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1035546

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Martin Greaves | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Raymond Pascoe | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Carolyn Nevin | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kevin Warrior | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHARON MARGARET TOWNEND | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Rudge | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Prater | Trustee | 18 April 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.