NEWTON PARK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We operate a pre school offering flexible sessions to the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £150,287
Total expenditure: £144,084

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PELICAN COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (CHESTER) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Forster Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Alexandra Nielson Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
karen Calvert Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
Amanda Davies Trustee 18 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £128.00k £126.05k £136.19k £164.18k £150.29k
Total expenditure £135.49k £125.34k £126.56k £144.30k £144.08k
Income from government contracts £112.89k £119.79k £122.86k £147.43k £134.01k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Newton Primary School
Kingsway West
CHESTER
CH2 2LA
Phone:
01244314271