Accounts and annual returns SIXTY PLUS

Charity number: 1035607
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 06 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 06 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 15 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 15 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 17 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 03 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 08 November 2006 On Time