SIXTY PLUS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sixty Plus aims to support older people to remain independent, to combat isolation, to promote partnerships between younger and older people, to encourage older people as volunteers and to work collaboratively to address gaps in provision. Working with volunteers, Sixty Plus provides flexible and practical assistance to support the well-being of older people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 25 March 1994: Standard registration
- 08 September 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 September 2010: Funds transferred to 1082658 AGE UK KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.90k | £299.17k | £299.12k | £379.38k | £361.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.69k | £280.48k | £326.94k | £370.56k | £369.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 06 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 06 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 15 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 15 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 17 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 17 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 03 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 08 November 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 1994.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS CHARITABLE IN LAW AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL DECIDE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SOCIAL ISOLATION; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ISSUES AFFECTING THE WELFARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window