THE LONDON HARNESS HORSE PARADE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve general condition, treatment and management of horses, ponies & donkeys. To encourage persons in charge of animals employed for transport to take humane & intelligent interest in their well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Peacock | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Peacock | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GUILLAUME ALAN YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR W A GILBEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.11k | £5.10k | £24.22k | £13.23k | £16.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.24k | £790 | £23.77k | £20.90k | £22.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 DECEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE GENERAL CONDITION TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF HORSES AND PONIES; (2) TO ENCOURAGE THOSE IN CHARGE OF HORSES AND PONIES EMPLOYED FOR TRANSPORT PURPOSES TO TAKE A HUMANE AND INTELLIGENT INTEREST IN THEIR WELL-BEING AND TO SHOW A SPIRIT OF KINDLINESS TOWARDS THEIR ANIMALS (3) TO ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST ALL THOSE USING HORSE-DRAWN TRANSPORT TO ACHIEVE A HIGH STANDARD OF CARE AND CLEANLINESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKLEY FARM
MERSTHAM
SURREY
RH1 3QN
- Phone:
- 01737645843
- Email:
- secretary@lhhp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window