Financial history COMMUNITY PSYCHIATRIC NURSES ASSOCIATION (1994)

Charity number: 1035626
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £679 £685 £692 £473 £231
Total expenditure £5.78k £13.11k £1.30k £4.41k £27.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A