INTERNATIONAL INTERFAITH CENTRE AT OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Network with International Interfaith Organisations. Provide websites to further understanding of different faiths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 March 1994: Standard registration
- I I C (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARANJIT AJIT SINGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
MILLIUS PALAYIWA | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Millius Palayiwa | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
DAVID STOREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.48k | £16.30k | £16.94k | £1.20k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £100 | £363 | £1.32k | £220 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1993 AND AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WORLD WIDE IN ITS UNDERSTANDING OF THE DIFFERENT FAITH TRADITIONS AND VARIOUS FAITH COMMUNITIES AND HOW THEY MIGHT LIVE TOGHETHER IN HARMONEY, BY ESTABLISHING A CENTRE TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OUSELEY CLOSE
MARSTON
OXFORD
OX3 0JS
- Phone:
- 01865725423
- Email:
- milliuspalayiwa@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window