BORRAS PARK PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Borras Park Playgroup is a place where children have fun and learn essential social and other skills before going on to school. It is a local charity which is held in Borras Community Centre. We are open Monday, Tuesday and Wednesday 9.15-2.45, Thursday 12.15-2.45 and Friday 9.15 - 11.45.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Wrexham
Governance
- 28 March 1994: Standard registration
- 19 August 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84k | £10.97k | £15.09k | £17.46k | £24.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.16k | £10.92k | £12.95k | £16.70k | £25.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 13 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 09 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 30 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window