THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, AYLESBURY VALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aylesbury Vale U3A is a body of people who undertake to learn and to help others to learn. It's objectives are the advancement of education and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Aylesbury Vale and its surrounding locality
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 March 1994: Standard registration
- AYLESBURY VALE U3A (Working name)
- THE AYLESBURY VALE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Perks | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Trow | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Lowe | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.55k | £6.86k | £34.70k | £48.70k | £43.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.59k | £6.72k | £31.89k | £51.70k | £42.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JANUARY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 12TH JANUARY 1994, 24TH JANUARY 1996, 22ND JANUARY 1997, 29TH OCTOBER 1997 AND 21ST OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
AYLESBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Chaffinch
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP19 0GQ
- Phone:
- 07778 515194
- Email:
- PHILTOLER3@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window