Financial history DUNKESWELL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1035663
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £76.93k £79.00k £65.42k £77.56k £0
Total expenditure £66.78k £73.06k £60.66k £91.42k £0
Income from government contracts £56.58k £58.10k £44.25k £53.73k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A