Beckley Preschool

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child care and education for children below compulsory school age in Beckley Village Centre and Northiam Nursery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £36,350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 25 March 1994: Standard registration
- BECKLEY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- BECKLEY PRE-SCHOOL AND NORTHIAM NURSERY (Previous name)
- BECKLEY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Cole | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Entwistle | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Appleton | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE BLOOMFIELD | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toni-Marie Berry | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Berry | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Chapman | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Briony Mason | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JILL BRAIN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.44k | £60.40k | £54.51k | £64.42k | £54.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.14k | £60.37k | £55.31k | £50.33k | £61.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.18k | £43.58k | N/A | £37.68k | £36.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 2001, 6 JULY 2001, 24 SEPTEMBER 2004, 7 JULY 2008 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2009 as amended on 05 Aug 2020 as amended on 01 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN BY: A. PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. B. ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. C. PROVIDING AND RUNNING THE BUZZY BEES TODDLER GROUP (BECKLEY) AND THE TADPOLES TODDLER GROUP (NORTHIAM)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beckley Village Hall
Main Street
Beckley
Rye
TN31 6RL
- Phone:
- 01797 260582
- Email:
- info@beckleypreschool.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window