Financial history WILLINGTOTS

Charity number: 1035672
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.71k £47.45k £53.16k £49.99k £64.59k
Total expenditure £40.68k £40.39k £55.11k £54.68k £53.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A