Governing document ST ALBANS U3A

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 1984 AS AMENDED ON 20 JAN 1998 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCT 2007 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 06 SEP 2017 as amended on 24 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN ST.ALBANS AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE-TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ST. ALBANS AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.