Trustees ST ALBANS U3A
Charity number: 1035678

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Browne | Chair | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Carey | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pat Van Tromp | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Seaton | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Hogg | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacqueline Sayers | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith O'Byrne | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Dear | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Watts | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hopkins | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Street | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul England | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.