Financial history Rotary Club of Bishops Cleeve Trust Fund

Charity number: 1035680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.70k £4.29k £4.28k £4.24k £10.59k
Total expenditure £18.91k £4.11k £11.66k £3.89k £5.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A