BURES PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise money to provide supplementary educational resources, activities and facilities to benefit the children attending Bures Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,244
Total expenditure: £4,188

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BURES PRIMARY SCHOOL PSA (Working name)
  • BURES SCHOOL PSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Phoebe Piper Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Donna Byford Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Joanne Kerry Kendall Trustee 16 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.08k £4.29k £2.11k £3.76k £8.24k
Total expenditure £10.22k £2.78k £2.07k £1.02k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bures C of E VC Primary School
Nayland Road
BURES
CO8 5BX
Phone:
01787 227446
Website:

No information available