Accounts and annual returns SHELF PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1035756
Charity reporting is up to date (130 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 November 2024 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 07 November 2024 130 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 November 2024 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 November 2024 496 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window