SHELF PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To share and develop and educate children under statutory school age by encouraging parents to become involved in the education of their children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £132,778 from 6 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 19 April 1994: Standard registration
- 08 November 2021: Funds received from 1048264 QUEENSBURY UNDER 5'S PLAYGROUP
- SHELF PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- SHELF PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Metcalf | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hamilton | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Hoban | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Wilson | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.37k | £87.14k | £100.29k | £94.47k | £160.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.20k | £99.66k | £104.57k | £100.64k | £134.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £102.38k | £74.12k | £85.62k | £75.00k | £132.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2024 | 496 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2024 | 496 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Halifax Road
Shelf
Halifax
HX3 7NT
- Phone:
- 01274676661
- Email:
- contact@shelfpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window