Financial history ELTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1035788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.59k £10.76k £1.04k £1.85k £1.79k
Total expenditure £1.78k £3.72k £2.12k £10.01k £7.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A