SOUTHPORT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Citizens Advice Bureau, offering advice and information service to the public living in \Southport and surrounding areas.we offer advice via drop-in service open 10.00- 2.00 Mon, Tues, Wed, Thurs. we offer specialist advice via projects for Debt, Mental Health and Elderly/ Carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sefton
Governance
- 30 March 1994: Standard registration
- 03 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOUTHPORT C.A.B. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.45k | £151.79k | £154.72k | £161.84k | £169.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.04k | £106.15k | £143.79k | £150.61k | £165.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 09 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 08 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 21 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 28 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 14 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 19 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 15 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPARATED 11 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SOUTHPORT.
Area of benefit
SOUTHPORT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window