ANDOVER SALTO GYMNASTICS CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes gymnastics and provides gymnastics coaching facilities. It operates a purpose built gymnastics centre in Andover Hampshire. It has achieved National Centre of Excellence status.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £16,770 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 April 1994: Standard registration
- SALTO (Working name)
- SALTO CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE BANNEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACEY TYLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN COKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN GUIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELANIE BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENN TULK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBRA ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN LAVELLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIFFANY LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACY FENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL BILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICKY GUIVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.98k | £51.79k | £54.54k | £51.31k | £77.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.15k | £45.90k | £66.35k | £55.04k | £65.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS RESIDENT IN THE ANDOVER AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND INSTRUCTION IN GYMNASTICS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ANDOVER, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pyle Cottage
Weyhill
Andover
SP11 8DT
- Phone:
- 01635868202
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window