Financial history SCAPEGOAT HILL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1035862
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £1.70k £1.73k £2.33k £2.49k £2.73k
Total expenditure £2.89k £2.06k £2.41k £2.00k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A