Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DAY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1035863
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted