AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DAY NURSERY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The African Caribbean Day Nursery is a community nursery meeting the educational needs of children from 6months to 5years old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income includes £70,301 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 07 April 1994: Standard registration
- 09 May 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DAY NURSERY (Working name)
- AFRICAN/CARIBBEAN DAY NURSERY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.71k | £117.77k | £100.06k | £69.57k | £134.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.27k | £130.10k | £109.50k | £79.98k | £126.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £34.09k | £70.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 1992 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 7 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE FROM AFRICAN OR CARIBBEAN ORIGIN IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS AND CARERS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window