SHAPWICK SQUIRRELS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a community run pre-school with an aim to provide high quality care and education for children below statutory school age while working in partnership with parents to help children learn and develop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 31 March 1994: Standard registration
- 30 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHAPWICK PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.76k | £51.76k | £31.96k | £34.02k | £32.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.47k | £39.66k | £32.13k | £31.09k | £32.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 13 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 13 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 16 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 16 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 16 December 2011 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 16 December 2011 | 169 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 26 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SHAPWICK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window