Helmdon Acorns Pre-School

Charity number: 1035898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an Early Years Pre-school open to children aged 2-4 yrs. Based in the village of Helmdon, also serving the surrounding villages and Brackley. We are a Committee led charity and actively run fundraisers during the year to raise funds to provide educational recourses for the children in our care. We have strong ties within the local community and local Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £96,766
Total expenditure: £90,740

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 21 August 2024: Funds received from 1038471 BLAKESLEY PLAYGROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HELMDON ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
  • HELMDON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Alott Chair 01 July 2022
None on record
Karla Meaton Trustee 01 January 2023
HELMDON ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Rachel Hurcombe Trustee 01 January 2023
HELMDON ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Anna Saunders Trustee 15 January 2020
HELMDON ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL
Recently registered
Jessica Lauren Jill Baseley Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £107.53k £97.59k £96.52k £99.84k £96.77k
Total expenditure £107.99k £95.54k £103.41k £101.63k £90.74k
Income from government contracts £74.05k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k N/A N/A £15.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 July 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 July 2023 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 November 2022 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 October 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 October 2020 98 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Helmdon Acorns Pre School
Hintons Close
Helmdon
BRACKLEY
NN13 5QP
Phone:
01295 768327