LYE SKILLS GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HANDICRAFTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Dudley
Governance
- 06 April 1994: Standard registration
- 27 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.07k | £7.01k | £11.20k | £6.84k | £3.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.42k | £6.97k | £8.66k | £9.14k | £6.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 06 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 11 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 30 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 29 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE BY: 1) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY IMPROVING THEIR COMMUNICATION SKILLS, THROUGH LEARNING BRAILLE, MOON, TYPING AND LOW VISION TECHNIQUES. 2) THE THERAPUTIC USE OF HANDICRAFTS AND ARTWORK.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LYE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window