Financial history HALESOWEN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1035944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.01k £22 £9.32k £12.40k £14.61k
Total expenditure £6.94k £311 £10.89k £11.83k £11.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A