Financial history ST EDWARD'S FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (CASTLE DONINGTON)

Charity Number: 1035961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.42k £1.35k £2.70k £4.66k £7.79k
Total expenditure £1.91k £3.70k £3.12k £4.82k £6.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A