FRIENDS OF TARLETON COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Friends of Tarleton Community Primary School raise funds from events involving parents and children. These funds are utilised to provide equipment to improve the quality of schooling life for the school children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 02 September 2024

Total income: £6,795
Total expenditure: £7,489

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF TARLETON COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hayley Anne Molyneux Chair 26 November 2021
None on record
Stephanie Donaghy-Sims Trustee 26 November 2021
None on record
Angela Townsley Trustee 12 November 2018
None on record
Mr C Upton Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/09/2020 03/09/2021 04/09/2022 05/09/2023 02/09/2024
Total gross income £2.24k £2.67k £7.03k £7.69k £6.80k
Total expenditure £3.38k £3.81k £7.08k £7.69k £7.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 September 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2023 26 July 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 September 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Hazel Grove
Tarleton
PRESTON
PR4 6DQ
Phone:
07801055855
Website:

No information available