Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF THORPE BAY CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1036005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £28.39k £18.19k £60.71k £8.34k £11.32k
Total expenditure £33.74k £12.93k £46.38k £15.68k £8.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A