Financial history FRIENDS OF SPRINGFIELD (PTA)

Charity Number: 1036040
Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/09/2018 09/09/2019 09/09/2020 09/09/2021 09/09/2022
Total gross income £22.85k £8.82k £2.21k £431 £4.63k
Total expenditure £15.22k £14.38k £394 £3.35k £6.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A