Lincoln u3a

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various self-help educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 April 1994: Standard registration
- THE LINCOLN UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Innes | Chair | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Patricia Graves | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Wilson | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Mitchell Elliott | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Albert Hunter | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Ruth Innes | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Frances Elliott | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Cameron York | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.19k | £2.53k | £3.45k | £3.18k | £6.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.37k | £2.65k | £3.50k | £3.81k | £7.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2019 as amended on 01 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Sycamore Close
LINCOLN
LN6 0RS
- Phone:
- 07803827878
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window