Accounts and annual returns LITTLE PIXIES PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity number: 1036052
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 11 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 30 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 30 June 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 30 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 30 June 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2012 27 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 27 June 2013 On Time