Financial history LITTLE PIXIES PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity number: 1036052
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £50.84k £60.22k £68.66k £66.46k £68.78k
Total expenditure £59.47k £63.63k £64.86k £64.67k £69.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0